Trustees NEW FRONTIERS LIFE CHURCH SOUTHAMPTON

Charity number: 1118978
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charlotte Rosemary Walker Chair 04 May 2020
None on record
Charles Edward Tomlin Trustee 21 January 2025
None on record
Peter Gordon Cox Trustee 19 September 2023
None on record
MATTHEW STEINBRECHER Trustee 30 January 2018
None on record
James Hatcher Trustee 18 May 2015
HAMPSHIRE CHRISTIAN EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
Jon Lawn Trustee 18 May 2015
None on record
DELA GBESEMETE Trustee
None on record