EXCELL 3 LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education of young people and their parents especially those from disadvantaged backgrounds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 August 2007: Standard registration
- THEOS HADOS LIMITED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AUDREY TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
||||||
CLIVE BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CHERON BYFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.70k | £3.64k | £7.51k | £1.41k | £259 | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.04k | £3.63k | £7.89k | £14.48k | £6.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 February 2021 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
01 February 2021 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 DECEMBER 2000, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 31 OCTOBER 2006 AND 28 SEPTEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY AND THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE: A) TO FURTHER THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR PARENTS AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE PARENTS OF YOUNG PEOPLE OF ETHNIC ORIGIN SO THAT THEY MAY HAVE FULL OPPORTUNITY TO GAIN THE EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING SKILLS NEEDED FOR THEIR INDIVIDUAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT. B) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF LOCAL COMMUNITIES IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT WHICH FACILITIES MAY WITHOUT LIMITATION INCLUDE THE PROVISION OF ADVOCACY, CHILD CARE SERVICES AND MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN LIFE SKILLS AND BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Beacon Court
Birmingham Road
Great Barr
BIRMINGHAM
B43 6NN
- Phone:
- 01213588618
- Email:
- info@excell3.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window