SYDNEY SMITH ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main concern of the Association is to promote the life and works of Sydney Smith by educating the general public in his contributions to religious toleration, social reform and civic wellbeing. The promotion of these subjects is pursued through publications and through lectures. In addition, the Association contributes towards the provision and upkeep of churches associated with Sydney Smith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 November 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Southall | Chair | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harry Yoxall | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN PRICE MA ALA | Trustee | 10 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr JEREMY CUNNINGHAM | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ARNOLD MAGOWAN ARTHURS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYDNESS MARIE BONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.14k | £2.60k | £5.51k | £1.17k | £1.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.77k | £2.04k | £691 | £1.91k | £652 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 18 SEPTEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED ON 15 SEPTEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LIFE AND WORKS OF SYDNEY SMITH. B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PRESERVATION AND UPKEEP OF CHURCHES CONNECTED WITH SYDNEY SMITH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PARISH CHURCHES AT FOSTON IN NORTH YORKSHIRE AND COMBE FLOREY IN SOMERSET.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Waysfield
Shute Road
Kilmington
Axminster
EX13 7ST
- Phone:
- 07748 254487
- Email:
- sydie.bones@btopenworld.com
- Website:
-
sydneysmith.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window