Financial history EURO QUALITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1119242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £595.88k £516.92k £717.82k £781.64k £109.31k
Total expenditure £517.96k £551.52k £627.59k £544.24k £639.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £595.88k £509.92k £707.82k £771.64k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £7.00k £10.00k £10.00k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £487.52k £359.52k £627.59k £544.24k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £1.01k £1.13k £1.07k £1.05k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £486.51k £358.40k £626.52k £543.19k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £30.44k £192.00k £0 £0 N/A