Financial history STEBBING MONTESSORI LIMITED

Charity number: 1122287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £34 £30
Total expenditure £13.85k £27.91k £3.66k £15.92k £13.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A