THE JEAN AND LESLIE CONNOR CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Relief of financial hardship and provide residential care and associated amenities for aged persons in need. 2. Advance education of young persons. 3. Advance the physical education of children and young persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 11 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Laura Cropper | Chair | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Isabel Harding | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Megan Harding | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rankin- Boyle | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
William Cropper | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr HILARY ELAINE CONNOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.52k | £6.42k | £6.44k | £6.97k | £4.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.17k | £33.63k | £24.86k | £24.03k | £5.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
3. APPLICATION OF INCOME. THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECT ("THE OBJECTS") (I) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND PROVIDE RESIDENTIAL CARE AND ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR AGED PERSONS IN NEED, SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE REQUIREMENT AND DISABILITIES OF SUCH PERSONS UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS. (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES AND GRANTS. (III) TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. (IV) TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE/THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOWKER'S GREEN COURT
BOWKER'S GREEN
AUGHTON
LANCASHIRE
L39 6TA
- Phone:
- 01695424200
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window