THE ARTS INCLUDED AT THORNHILL (TAIT)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of young people from Sunderland, one of the most historically disadvantaged areas in the country, in particular but not exclusively, those pupils who are at risk of exclusion, by the provision of personal, social, health and citizenship education through arts based activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Sunderland
Governance
- 07 January 2008: Standard registration
- 21 December 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.40k | £11.01k | £7.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.29k | £6.98k | £11.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 28 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 20 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 24 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 26 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE * TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE FROM SUNDERLAND, ONE OF THE MOST HISTORICALLY DISADVANTAGED AREAS IN IN COUNTRY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE PUPILS WHO ARE AT RISK OF EXCLUSION, BY THE PROVISION OF PERSONAL, SOCIAL, HEALTH AND CITIZENSHIP EDUCATION THROUGH ARTS BASED ACTIVITIES. * TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE ABOVE AREA IN SUCH AWAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN SOCIETY .
Area of benefit
SUNDERLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window