THE BUTTERFLY FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Butterfly Foundation is a support group for survivors of domestic abuse. We run weekly workshops with members exploring creativity, healing, massage, reiki, mediation and art workshops. We also run a 12 week Freedom programme course which helps to understand perpetrator's behaviour and encourages breaking the cycle of abuse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- 04 March 2008: Standard registration
- 09 May 2013: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 09 May 2013: Funds transferred to 1150861 THE BUTTERFLY FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.68k | £80.56k | £72.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.54k | £64.62k | £78.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 03 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 02 May 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 29 July 2011 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 07 June 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 29 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 29 June 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND RAISE AWARENESS IN ALL ASPECTS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE, BE IT PHYSICAL, MENTAL, EMOTIONAL AND/OR SEXUAL THROUGH THE ARTS (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) 2 IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE, TO EMPOWER SURVIVORS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE THROUGH (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THE ARTS. THIS WOULD INCLUDE BRINGING TOGETHER GROUPS AND INDIVIDUALS IN A PROCESS OF MUTUAL SUPPORT, EDUCATION, INFORMATION SHARING AND WORKING TO IMPROVE KNOWLEDGE OF ALL AREAS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE AND ITS AFFECTS ON INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILY MEMBERS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE DORSET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window