ACTION VILLAGE INDIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Action Village India is a small UK-based charity that is since 1989 supporting Indian partner organisations who work alongside villagers in some of the most remote parts of rural India so they can improve their lives, livelihoods, and resilience. We work with local partners on projects supporting education, health, land rights, disability rights, women's rights and sustainable livelihoods.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
Governance
- 17 April 2007: Standard registration
- 18 January 2020: Funds received from 248046 VOSA LIMITED
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDY RUTHERFORD | Chair | 21 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Meera Kirankumar Patel | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aditya Dilipkumar | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Morrison | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Theroshene Naidoo | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rose Elizabeth Bradbury | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Crestini | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Prabodh Mukul Agarwal | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Adams | Trustee | 05 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elanor Catherine Jackson | Trustee | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
PALLAVI MODHA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.50k | £196.20k | £211.49k | £181.89k | £221.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £181.37k | £220.86k | £187.50k | £230.52k | £205.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 16 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
THE ALLEVIATION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM TO THOSE IN NEED WITHOUT DISTINCTION BY: 3.1 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT, INFORMATION, ADVICE, VOLUNTEER LABOUR, OPPORTUNITY FOR MUTUAL LESSON LEARNING, OR ASSISTANCE IN SUCH PROVISION, FOR THE POOR AND NEEDY IN INDIA AND SUCH OTHER DEVELOPING COUNTRIES AS MAY SEEM APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME; 3.2 THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT FOR SUCH PERSONS, WITH THE PURPOSE OF DEVELOPING SKILLS TO ENABLE THEM TO IMPROVE THEIR STANDARD OF LIVING INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) INCOME, HEALTH AND LITERACY AND TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEIR ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT; 3.3 THE SUPPORT OF THE WORK OF OTHER CHARITIES OR AGENCIES IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY WHETHER IN INDIA OR OTHER DEVELOPING COUNTRIES AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY THE EXCHANGE OF RESOURCES, INFORMATION AND EXPERTISE WITH OTHER CHARITIES OR AGENCIES WORLD WIDE; 3.4 RAISING AWARENESS IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS OF ISSUES AFFECTING POOR AND MARGINALISED PEOPLE IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES; 3.5 THE FULFILLING OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW AS BEING CHARITABLE AND WHICH THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
ACTION VILLAGE INDIA
5 BALLS POND ROAD
LONDON
N1 4AX
- Phone:
- 02072415125
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window