FLORENCE NIGHTINGALE HOSPICE CHARITY

Charity number: 1119499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity supports the work of Florence Nightingale Hospice through total funding of specific services such as the Children's Hospice at Home, Day Hospice, Lymphoedema service, and part-funding of inpatient nursing, Nightingale 24/7 service and community palliative care nurses. We raise £790,000 per annum through donations, fundraising, gifts in a will, shops and a local hospices' lottery.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 June 2007: Standard registration
  • 16 February 2016: Funds received from 802733 THE FRIENDS OF FLORENCE NIGHTINGALE HOUSE
  • 01 April 2022: Funds received from 295739 HADDENHAM AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN
  • 06 May 2022: Funds received from 1074496 JESSIE ELIZABETH KENT CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
  • Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
  • Financial Conduct Authority
  • Homes England
  • Healthcare Inspectorate Wales (HIW)
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
  • Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NOEL JOHN RATCLIFFE Chair 28 September 2016
None on record
Dr Diana Straker Trustee 20 March 2024
None on record
Nigel Thompson Trustee 20 March 2024
None on record
Tracey O'Hara Trustee 31 May 2023
None on record
Christopher John Shennan Trustee 06 March 2022
None on record
Mark Robert Fabes Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Simon Jonathan Jones Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Deborah Anne Earnshaw Trustee 28 November 2018
BILLINGTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Peter Cotton Trustee 14 March 2018
None on record
PETER LINDLEY BRIDGMAN BSC FRICS Trustee 26 April 2017
None on record
JANE LILLIAN NAISMITH Trustee 26 April 2017
None on record
JOHN LEGGETT Trustee 09 January 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.01m £1.95m £4.35m £3.89m £4.59m
Total expenditure £2.26m £2.34m £2.94m £3.37m £4.11m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £424.81k £29.82k £216.74k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.47m £1.16m £2.54m £1.69m £1.99m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £689.80k £1.74m £1.89m £2.37m
Income - Charitable activities £1.41m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £126.89k £96.31k £71.47k £90.74k £226.78k
Income - Other £1.80k £150 £0 £216.74k £0
Income - Legacies £620.03k £107.52k £1.49m £621.99k £588.26k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.78m £1.12m £1.22m £1.29m £1.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £475.35k £1.23m £1.72m £2.08m £2.67m
Expenditure - Governance £48.82k £94.66k £115.37k £108.93k £99.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £936.74k £887.24k £954.69k £1.07m £1.20m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £17.37k £3.87k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £78.93k £299.19k £271.52k £482.12k £489.89k
Long-term investments £4.41m £5.18m £5.37m £5.24m £6.42m
Other assets £1.34m £592.51k £2.00m £2.40m £2.01m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £974.86k £597.25k £340.01k £498.51k £552.43k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 07 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Florence Nightingale Hospice
Charity
Walton Lodge
Walton Street
AYLESBURY
HP21 7QY
Phone:
01296429975