SEVERN FREEWHEELERS EMERGENCY VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Severn Freewheelers provide a free courier service to the NHS in North Wiltshire, Gloucestershire, Herefordshire and Worcestershire to transport urgently needed items such as blood, drugs and samples. Ten emergency service bikes and three cars are available 365 days a year, with members working week days, evenings and weekends. Fleet riders & drivers hold Advanced Licences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Wiltshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 27 September 2007: Standard registration
- SEVERN FREEWHEELERS EVS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Fairbank | Chair | 30 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Bruno Clements | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Wellon | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Edward Clark | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Grover | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin John Marsden | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JOHN SADLER | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.16k | £89.97k | £89.69k | £149.07k | £191.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.87k | £66.36k | £108.52k | £129.74k | £115.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/01/2007 AS AMENDED ON 31/08/2007 AS AMENDED ON 29/01/2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROTECT HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF TRANSPORT OF URGENTLY NEEDED BLOOD, DRUGS, HUMAN TISSUES AND OTHER MEDICAL REQUIREMENTS BETWEEN HOSPITALS AND BLOOD TRANSFUSION BANKS PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN GLOUCESTERSHIRE, HEREFORDSHIRE, WILTSHIRE AND WORCESTERSHIRE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, GLOUCESTERSHIRE, WORCESTERSHIRE, HEREFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
SEVERN FREEWHEELERS E V S
PO BOX 220
CIRENCESTER
GL7 9BJ
- Phone:
- 07597672586
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window