Accounts and annual returns THE MURRY FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1119245
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2014 17 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2014 Not Required