Financial history Community Transport South West Ltd

Charity number: 1118417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £619.36k £632.76k £733.10k £835.83k £924.83k
Total expenditure £605.35k £602.71k £740.59k £856.71k £936.52k
Income from government contracts £453.96k £611.14k £668.31k £756.50k £818.37k
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.01k £10.87k £2.65k £0 £30
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £11.39k £0
Income - Charitable activities £603.82k £611.14k £719.95k £824.44k £910.51k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £70 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £10.46k £10.75k £10.51k £0 £14.29k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £605.35k £602.71k £740.59k £856.71k £936.52k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0