Accounts and annual returns HEART OF COMPASSION TRUST

Charity number: 1127601
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 01 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 30 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 05 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required