Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF SOUTHPORT MEOLS TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1118518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £4.09k £36 £4.73k £9.44k £5.02k
Total expenditure £3.38k £270 £4.37k £9.06k £5.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A