DOW GRADUATES ASSOCIATION OF NORTHERN EUROPE (DOGANE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and facilitate educational activities undertaken by graduates from DOW Medical College currently working in Northern Europe; and to help raise funds for charitable projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Pakistan
Governance
- 25 September 2008: Standard registration
- DOW GRATUATE ASSOCIATION OF NORTHEN EUROPE (DOGANE) (Previous name)
- DOW GRATUATE ASSOCIATIONS OF NORTHERN EUROPE (DOGANE) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SHAHED QURAISHI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Khurram Mustafa | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nadia Badr | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Imran Ghanghro | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Adeel Siddiqui | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shabi Ahmad | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Saqib Ghani | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Syed Iftikhar | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
UMAR DARAZ KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR SHAHABULLAH QURASHI | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.20k | £24.97k | £39.61k | £46.55k | £53.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.24k | £35.28k | £29.18k | £57.07k | £66.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 SEPTEMBER 2008 as amended on 28 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RESEARCH UNDERTAKEN BY GRADUATES FROM DOW COLLEGE CURRENTLY WORKING IN NORTHERN EUROPE AND DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEVE POVERTY IN ASIA.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
195 Southend Arterial Road
HORNCHURCH
Essex
RM11 2SF
- Phone:
- 07747128363
- Email:
- INFO@DOGANE.CO.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window