Financial history THE COWES HAMMERHEAD CRANE TRUST

Charity Number: 1119813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/11/2020 15/11/2021 15/11/2022 15/11/2023 15/11/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £500
Total expenditure £193 £193 £206 £226 £260
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A