THE DUKE OF YORK'S COMMUNITY INITIATIVE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or of political, religious or other opinions, any charitable purpose for the benefit of the inhabitants of the United Kingdom and, in particular, those of the county of Yorkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 June 2007: Standard registration
- 24 July 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE DUKE OF YORK'SCOMMUNITY INITIATIVE (Previous name)
- THE YORKSHIRE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.29k | £14.00k | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.47k | £30.60k | £34.90k | £524 | £883 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 May 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 May 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/09/2011
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE (WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR THE INHABITANTS OF THE COUNTY OF YORKSHIRE BY BRINGING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS, THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT AND/OR BY ACTING AS AN UMBRELLA ORGANISATION (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO: (A) PROVIDE RELIEF FROM FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AND TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN THE LIFE OF THEIR COMMUNITY IN WAYS WHICH ADDRESS AND ALLEVIATE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE; (B) PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID INHABITANTS URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES, THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; AND THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR THE COUNTY OF YORKSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window