Accounts and annual returns NORFOLK CONCERTS

Charity Number: 1118886
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2012 17 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 13 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 26 July 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 23 November 2010 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 23 November 2010 23 days late