Financial history THE MUSEUM OF POLICING IN CHESHIRE

Charity number: 1126935
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.54k £1.34k £1.33k £5.01k £8.25k
Total expenditure £6.09k £1.12k £931 £2.08k £5.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A