Trustees THE MUSEUM OF POLICING IN CHESHIRE
Charity number: 1126935

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Ford | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Roberts Mr | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Davies Mr | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Edith Hall MP | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Hunt | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Upham | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.