NEW COLLEGE WORCESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
New College Worcester is a residential school for blind and partially sighted children and young people aged 11-19. As well as a full curriculum with a wide range of GCSE and A-Levels, the development of independent living skills and an extensive programme of extra-curricular activities is part of the educational provision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£6,331,172
Donations and legacies | £378.23k | |
Charitable activities | £5.87m | |
Other trading activities | £3.18k | |
Investments | £79.03k | |
Other | £2.39k |
Total expenditure:
£6,356,782
Raising funds | £41.08k | |
Charitable activities | £6.32m | |
Other | £0 |
-£24,223 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,918,578 from 68 government contract(s) and £911,532 from 10 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £41.08k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.32m |
People

162 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 September 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Dyson | Chair | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Sweeney | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Clark | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Jane Gorick | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Ann Mauro-Bracken | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Ashby Williams | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Stephen Price | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Perks | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Peter Lawrence | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lady Linda Morris | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Philippa Ann Simkiss | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Steven Andrew Tyler | Trustee | 02 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.49m | £4.57m | £5.36m | £6.23m | £6.33m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.60m | £4.48m | £4.71m | £5.61m | £6.36m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £3.10m | £3.50m | N/A | N/A | £4.92m | |
|
Income from government grants | £700.90k | £650.00k | £98.90k | £282.19k | £911.53k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £534.17k | £340.68k | £386.49k | £465.72k | £378.23k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £8.40k | £5.36k | £7.32k | £13.91k | £3.18k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.81m | £4.15m | £4.90m | £5.66m | £5.87m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £130.52k | £62.69k | £52.98k | £77.50k | £79.03k | |
|
Income - Other | £14.31k | £11.29k | £13.40k | £17.81k | £2.39k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £161.65k | £122 | £12.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.53m | £4.42m | £4.64m | £5.52m | £6.32m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £69.42k | £54.22k | £75.25k | £85.34k | £41.08k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £76.19k | £57.23k | £0 | £44.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.21k | £5.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £14.49m | £14.52m | £14.71m | £14.83m | £15.01m | |
|
Long-term investments | £905.99k | £707.19k | £865.91k | £740.67k | £713.52k | |
|
Other assets | £679.58k | £908.14k | £1.44m | £1.95m | £1.88m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£317.00k | -£296.00k | -£269.00k | -£378.00k | -£331.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £826.63k | £825.69k | £921.47k | £936.68k | £1.11m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 July 2020 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 24 July 2020 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/01/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/01/2012
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE A RELIGIOUS, SOCIAL AND ACADEMIC EDUCATION FOR YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE VISUALLY IMPAIRED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND, THE CHANNEL ISLANDS AND THE ISLE OF MAN AND ELSEWHERE IN THE COMMONWEALTH AND, SUBJECT THERETO, FROM ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD, WITH THE ANCILLARY PURPOSE OF SUPPORTING AND FACILITATING GENERALLY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION FOR SUCH YOUNG PERSONS; B) TO TAKE OVER THE WHOLE (OR ANY PART OF WHICH MAY BE LEGALLY VESTED IN THE CHARITABLE COMPANY) OF THE PROPERTY BELONGING TO, AND TO UNDERTAKE ANY AND ALL THE LIABILITIES OF, THE UNINCORPORATED CHARITY CURRENTLY KNOWN AS "R.N.I.B NEW COLLEGE WORCESTER" (BUT FORMERLY KNOWN AS "WORCESTER COLLEGE FOR THE BLIND") WHICH IS REGULATED BY A DEED OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 14TH AUGUST 1936 (AS SUBSEQUENTLY AMENDED) AND WHICH IS REGISTERED WITH THE CHARITY COMMISSION ("THE COMMISSION") UNDER NUMBER 527110 ("THE EXISTING CHARITY"); C) TO MANAGE AND CONDUCT NEW COLLEGE WORCESTER (INCORPORATING WORCESTER COLLEGE FOR THE BLIND AND CHORLEYWOOD COLLEGE FOR GIRLS WITH LITTLE OR NO SIGHT) ("THE COLLEGE") AND TO HOLD AND ADMINISTER ITS PROPERTY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS SET OUT IN THE CHARITABLE COMPANY'S MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ("THE ARTICLES"), BUT IN PARTICULAR TO SECURE THAT THE RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION GIVEN IN THE COLLEGE IS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND, THE CHANNEL ISLANDS AND THE ISLE OF MAN AND ELSEWHERE IN THE COMMONWEALTH
Linked charities
- ALLEN BEQUEST
- ARTHUR PEARSON PRIZE FUND
- BLAIR AND FORSTER MEMORIAL FUND
- BLAIR AND FORSTER SCHOLARSHIP
- CLIFTON PRIZE
- DAVIES MATHEMATICS PRIZE FUND
- HIMING PRIZE FUND
- MRS TYLOR'S GOOD CITIZENSHIP PRIZE
- NEW COLLEGE WORCESTER TRUST
- NUFFIELD ENDOWMENT
- THE RNIB NEW COLLEGE SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION
- TYLOR PRIZE FOR HANDICRAFTS
- WILLIAM BROWN HEXTALL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- 15 September 1965 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
New College
Whittington Road
WORCESTER
WR5 2JX
- Phone:
- 01905763933
- Email:
- office@ncw.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window