Financial history CHANDRAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1128023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £243.81k £104.35k £193.45k £322.40k £334.17k
Total expenditure £149.04k £129.93k £154.76k £297.40k £449.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £72.12k £22.19k £30.00k £30.00k