Financial history MERSEYSIDE POLICE FEDERATION CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1119125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £59.86k £36.91k £70.08k £66.61k £76.05k
Total expenditure £59.00k £36.29k £45.44k £100.56k £76.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A