YOUTHSHIFT iNTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Series of educational related and youth mentoring programmes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 March 2008: Standard registration
- PRIDE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BOBBY DANSO | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev Ben Osei Owusu Ansah | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edith Chidinma Unadike | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £60 | £520 | £695 | £1.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £100 | £884 | £1.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2021 | 363 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 FEBRUARY 2006 AS AMENDED 25 JANUARY 2008 as amended on 10 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO AGE OF SIX 20 LIVING IN LONDON BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (B) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (C) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE ACTIVITY IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jubilee Christian Ministries
Unit W/47
560-568 High Road
LONDON
N17 9TA
- Phone:
- 07958442376
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window