HOYLANDSWAINE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hoylandswaine Village Hall provides a meeting point and venue for a wide range of local activities contributing to the social life and well-being of the village and wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnsley
Governance
- 28 March 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Kirkham | Chair | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Marie Bellamy | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Bellamy | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Walker | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Schofield | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Julie Patricia Vickers | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bronwen Barber | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Louise Field | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN JANE OGLE | Trustee | 29 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN IBBOTSON | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARGARET SAMMON | Trustee | 28 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Spenceley | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.72k | £12.83k | £23.22k | £7.44k | £7.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.30k | £7.20k | £5.74k | £8.43k | £13.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.36k | £10.23k | £18.54k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF HOYLANDSWAINE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING THE USE OF MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
HOYLANDSWAINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 CHAPPELL CLOSE
HOYLANDSWAINE
SHEFFIELD
S36 7LD
- Phone:
- 07920408519
- Website:
-
hoylandswainevillagehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window