CANADA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A) The relief of poverty in the Jewish community worldwide. B) The advancement of education according to the beliefs and values of the Jewish faith worldwide. C) Any charitable purpose at the discretion of the trustees for the benefit of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of London
- Manchester City
- Israel
Governance
- 18 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zvi Sinitsky | Trustee | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MAURICE MOHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN MOHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 14 August 2024 | 230 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 12 January 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE JEWISH COMMUNITY WORLDWIDE; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ACCORDING TO THE BELIEFS AND VALUES OF THE JEWISH FAITH WORLDWIDE; 3. ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Downham Crescent
Prestwich
MANCHESTER
M25 0EH
- Phone:
- 07774869464
- Email:
- alan@addtrading.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window