SIKH COMMUNITY AND YOUTH SERVICES SLOUGH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community cohesion; workshops; youth club activities including all sports.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Slough
Governance
- 15 August 2007: Standard registration
- 21 August 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2008 | 30/06/2009 | 30/06/2010 | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.96k | £25.19k | £45.38k | £121.34k | £145.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.52k | £32.21k | £64.29k | £72.95k | £88.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28 APRIL 2007 AND 8 MAY 2008.
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR EDUCATION AND RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE SIKH COMMUNITY OF SLOUGH AND GREATER LONDON WHO MAY HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
SLOUGH AND GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window