JAMIAT AHL-E-HADITH NOTTINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a mosque in the area of Nottingham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 30 March 2007: Standard registration
- MASJID UMAR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAJID MAHMOOD | Chair |
|
||||||
LIAQAT MAHMOOD AZIZ | Trustee | 22 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
SAJJAD AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.48k | £93.98k | £124.96k | £158.03k | £129.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.62k | £44.06k | £74.52k | £45.64k | £35.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 October 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 FEBRUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION BY WAY OF: 1) THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AN ISLAMIC CENTRE. 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PRACTICE OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH. 3) THE FACILITATION OF COMMUNAL ACTIVATES. 4) THE PROVISION AND FACILITATION OF ISLAMIC EDUCATION FOR ADULTS AND CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NOTTINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 DALE GROVE
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 4LT
- Phone:
- 01158470183
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window