GOLDEN HILL SPORTS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Golden Hill Sports is a community-based charity that runs a sporting club for its members. GHS runs cricket for adult, ladies,girls and boys youth teams and a youth football section. We also run a Social Club for the benefit of the Club members and for the local community. In addition we hold various social events which are for members and the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 26 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH MILSOM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Georgina Abigail Bradbury Hodge | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Aloysius Murphy | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|||||
James Robert Woodworth | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROBERT COLLEY | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS JAMES MILSOM | Trustee | 25 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK EDWARD STEER | Trustee | 25 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.96k | £113.10k | £172.61k | £227.57k | £235.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.78k | £86.67k | £151.07k | £227.95k | £218.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £350 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.34k | £8.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 FEBRUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY ORGANISING OR PROVIDING (OR ASSISTING IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF) FACILITIES FOR PLAYING CRICKET; AND 2) SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE HENLEAZE, BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 STANSHALLS LANE
FELTON
BRISTOL
BS40 9UG
- Phone:
- 07967467161
- Email:
- info@goldenhillsports.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window