Financial history Linkable Woking

Charity Number: 1119596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £597.30k £412.76k £455.57k £519.41k £600.43k
Total expenditure £549.67k £390.40k £451.48k £534.73k £600.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £190.01k £187.66k £240.22k
Income from government grants £227.00k N/A £52.44k £34.20k £34.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £175.49k N/A N/A £182.52k £189.88k
Income - Other trading activities £49.63k N/A N/A £0 £18.11k
Income - Charitable activities £371.99k N/A N/A £301.66k £388.75k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £201 N/A N/A £1.53k £2.96k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £33.70k £738
Income - Legacies £80.00k N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £482.00k N/A N/A £490.63k £561.81k
Expenditure - Raising funds £67.68k N/A N/A £44.10k £39.03k
Expenditure - Governance £19.10k N/A N/A £0 £2.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0