Accounts and annual returns ZOMBA MENTAL HEALTH LINK

Charity number: 1119153
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2025 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 April 2022 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required