CANCER OF UNKNOWN PRIMARY (CUP) FOUNDATION - JO'S FRIENDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to Make the Unknown, Known by: Providing information and support to CUP patients and those who care for them; Raising awareness of CUP; Promoting improved treatment and the end of CUP; Undertaking or supporting CUP research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 May 2007: Standard registration
- 12 June 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 12 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1201654 THE CHRISTIE CHARITY
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2019 | 01/10/2020 | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.63k | £50.94k | £43.22k | £30.05k | £71.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.83k | £24.31k | £17.60k | £8.27k | £460.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 October 2019 | 05 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2019 | 05 December 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL TRUST DEED, DATED 27 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH BY:- (A) RAISING THE AWARENESS OF ONCOLOGISTS, RADIOLOGISTS, ONCOLOGY RESEARCHERS, GENETICISTS, GPS, NURSES, CANCER CHARITIES AND THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL OF CANCER OF UNKNOWN PRIMARY (CUP) AND ITS EFFECTS AND EPIDEMIOLOGY. (B) PROMOTING IMPROVED TREATMENT AND ERADICATION OF CUP. (C) UNDERTAKING OR SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF CUP AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. (D) PROVIDING INFORMATION AND SUPPORT, AND THEREBY PROVIDING RELIEF, TO CUP PATIENTS AND THEIR CARERS AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window