BURY ST EDMUNDS HERITAGE TRUST

Charity Number: 1119059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To improve the heritage provision in Suffolk for the benefit of everyone

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £92,600
Total expenditure: £125,845

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 May 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Silke David Trustee 05 December 2023
None on record
Alexandra Yvette Gilmour Trustee 06 September 2022
None on record
Grant Howlett Trustee 06 September 2022
KING EDWARD THE SIXTH GRAMMAR SCHOOL, BURY ST EDMUNDS, FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ST. JOHN'S SCHOOL CENTRE
Received: On time
Peter Langdon Trustee 17 June 2022
ROUGHAM PLAYING FIELD
Received: On time
STEPHEN COOK Trustee 15 January 2020
ROTARY CLUB OF BURY ST EDMUNDS CHARITY FUND
Received: On time
BURY ST. EDMUNDS PAST & PRESENT SOCIETY
Received: On time
SIMON FRANCIS POTT FRICS Trustee
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: 133 days late
THE ICKWORTH CHURCH CONSERVATION TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT
Received: 133 days late
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
THE DAY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON
Received: 133 days late
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
GENERAL THE HONOURABLE SIR WILLIAM HERVEY
Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days
THE LITTLE GIDDING TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £47.78k £106.80k £73.26k £96.43k £92.60k
Total expenditure £206.74k £92.34k £91.67k £129.87k £125.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £37.00k £29.60k £15.00k £15.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
79 Whiting Street
Bury St. Edmunds
IP33 1NX
Phone:
01284247037