THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD, ABUNDANT LIFE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of religion, promotion of education and health, relief of poverty, UK and overseas aid and missions support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 08 June 2007: Standard registration
- REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD (RCCG) CHURCH WITH A MISSION, WITHAM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pastor Ayokunle Oyedipe | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nkechi Amara Nlewedim | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
FOSTER ASAMANI | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.83k | £12.21k | £13.71k | £21.08k | £7.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.12k | £14.12k | £13.21k | £19.72k | £11.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10/10/2011
Charitable objects
2.2.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE 2.2.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Haig Court
CHELMSFORD
CM2 0BH
- Phone:
- 07454835592
- Email:
- rccgwitham@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window