Accounts and annual returns YIPPEE

Charity number: 1120378
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required