Financial history YIPPEE

Charity number: 1120378
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.74k £3.58k £209 £3.78k £2.17k
Total expenditure £2.69k £3.40k £799 £2.19k £393
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A