Financial history YELLOWBALL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1118546
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £18.64k £1.88k £3.41k £13.90k £2.75k
Total expenditure £20.75k £4.33k £4.29k £8.32k £6.78k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A