COMMUNITY OF CHRIST - BRITISH ISLES MISSION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Community of Christ is a Christian church whose purpose and mission is to proclaim Jesus Christ and promote communities of joy, hope, love, and peace. The British Isles Mission Centre exists to support congregations, facilitate church expansion, and provide linkage between World Church ministries and congregations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 June 2007: Standard registration
- 04 January 2017: Funds received from 247927 COMMUNITY OF CHRIST (BERESFORD ROAD)
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wayne Marc Farmer | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrew Brian Fellows | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Elizabeth Tilbury | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Gillian Vincent | Trustee | 17 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW FOX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.19k | £456.76k | £215.78k | £101.74k | £229.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.70k | £290.20k | £170.90k | £201.41k | £173.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 02 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 02 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINE AND STATEMENTS OF BELIEF OF THE COMMUNITY OF CHRIST
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMMUNITY OF CHRIST
THANET STREET
CLAY CROSS
CHESTERFIELD
S45 9JS
- Phone:
- 01246768831
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window