East Surrey Performing Arts

Charity Number: 1122724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To educate the public in the dramatic and operatic arts. To further the development of public appreciation and taste in the said arts. To endeavour to ensure that Redhill continues to have a theatre available for use by all residents. To promote Operas, Operettas and other musicals of educative value.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £118,250
Total expenditure: £88,274

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 February 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • EAST SURREY OPERATIC SOCIETY AND THE OPERA CLUB OF REIGATE AND REDHILL (Previous name)
  • East Surrey Performing Arts (Previous name)
  • THE OPERA CLUB OF REIGATE AND REDHILL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julia Stevens Chair 29 March 2022
None on record
Meghan Georgina Richards Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Amelia Kim Cavalier Hulbert Trustee 29 March 2022
None on record
Terry Foster Trustee 29 March 2022
None on record
Dr Julian Richard Paul Bond Trustee 18 March 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £91.91k £8.57k £36.95k £95.81k £118.25k
Total expenditure £80.70k £6.89k £57.57k £107.58k £88.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £550 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 02 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 Russells Crescent
HORLEY
RH6 7DJ
Phone:
01293774212
Email:
No information available