Financial history DUNDONALD PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1121689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £69.47k £86.60k £30.06k £37.82k £57.73k
Total expenditure £66.08k £72.05k £32.19k £30.22k £36.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A