DUNDONALD PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parent Teacher Association raising money for the benefit of the Primary School and the pupils who attend it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Merton
Governance
- 27 November 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Deol | Chair | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Mary Price | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Kemsley | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kate Silverstein | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laurien Gloag | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tara Jayne Macsweeney | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Crowley | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Peck | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ili Afifuddin | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.47k | £86.60k | £30.06k | £37.82k | £57.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.08k | £72.05k | £32.19k | £30.22k | £36.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 January 2024 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 January 2024 | 184 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 September 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 22 September 2022 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/01/2007 AS AMENDED ON 19/10/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
WIMBLEDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
DUNDONALD PRIMARY SCHOOL
DUNDONALD ROAD
LONDON
SW19 3QH
- Phone:
- 02087151188
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window