GRIMETHORPE COLLIERY BAND LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Brass Band playing music to the public by way of giving concerts We develop young players and arrange Brass & Percussion workshops We are endeavouring to keep alive the heritage of Brass Bands.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 June 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Osborne Coe | Chair | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roger Barry Webster | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nigel Clarke | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Louise Cocliff | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Craig Roberts | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.66k | £117.66k | £73.60k | £136.61k | £149.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.48k | £120.48k | £57.80k | £144.08k | £233.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £33.26k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 March 2024 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 March 2024 | 139 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 June 2023 | 224 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 June 2023 | 224 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 FEBRUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE THE STUDY, PRACTICE AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF BRASS BAND MUSIC IN ALL ITS FORMS IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE OR OTHERWISE TRAINING AND EDUCATION OF BRASS PLAYERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ACORN CENTRE
51 HIGH STREET
GRIMETHORPE
BARNSLEY
S72 7LR
- Phone:
- 01226780981
- Email:
- contact@grimethorpe.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window