GILLING EAST VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to promote the health, well being, and interaction of the people of Gilling East and its associated hamlets by converting the former village school building into a village hall and playing field as a centre for indoor and outdoor activities. This project seeks to encourage the cohesion of the community, promoting a sense of belonging and community responsibility.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 April 2007: Standard registration
- GILLING EAST OLD SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev James Trowsdale | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Aherne | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Alan Worden | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA MARY HUDSON | Trustee | 12 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SIMON THOMAS HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.70k | £22.72k | £17.73k | £8.37k | £9.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.67k | £4.19k | £17.35k | £13.06k | £11.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED 23 MAY 2005.
Charitable objects
C. OBJECTS. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: FR THE PURPOSE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GILLING EAST WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING THE USE OF THE PROPERTY FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF GILLIGN EAST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARTON HOUSE
STATION ROAD
GILLING EAST
YORK
YO62 4JL
- Phone:
- 01439788059
- Email:
- harton1988@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window