Financial history COMBINATION DANCE COMPANY

Charity number: 1123954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.60k £36.56k £79.54k £60.67k £95.11k
Total expenditure £23.91k £19.62k £64.62k £74.69k £90.27k
Income from government contracts £6.17k £884 £3.72k £4.75k £5.78k
Income from government grants £9.45k £13.83k £19.19k £19.02k £22.70k