Financial history EAST OF ENGLAND APPLES AND ORCHARDS PROJECT

Charity number: 1120084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £109.10k £76.07k £75.66k £85.37k £99.30k
Total expenditure £60.70k £43.02k £64.44k £81.47k £91.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £17.79k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A