Trustees EAST OF ENGLAND APPLES AND ORCHARDS PROJECT
Charity Number: 1120084

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Metcalfe | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Finlay Maclennan | Trustee | 15 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kornelia Deppe | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Lewis | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Wayman | Trustee | 11 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Wileman | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Thomas Neil Reeve | Trustee | 08 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLARE VERONICA STIMSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.