GIRL - INDIA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have now set up an education fund in north India which meets the costs of sending over 100 needy girls to school. The girls live in various villages in Himachal Pradesh and we provide uniforms, shoes, books as well covering the cost of school fees. Abandoned women/widows are now supplied with looms/sewing machines to give them the means to earn a living.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- India
- Nepal
Governance
- 13 August 2007: Standard registration
- 10 October 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- GIRL INDIA (GIRLS INSTITUTE FOR REHABILITATION AND LEARNING (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.14k | £12.42k | £6.48k | £8.28k | £7.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.10k | £10.56k | £6.07k | £6.27k | £7.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 25 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 29 August 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 13 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 21 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 JULY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 10 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF GIRLS IN INDIA.
Area of benefit
INDIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window