WESTON AND NORTH SOMERSET DISABILITY INFORMAITON & ADVICE LINE (DIAL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer free, impartial and confidential information and support to disabled people their families and carers. We hold surgeries throughout the county of North Somerset.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Somerset
Governance
- 18 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM MARTIN ANDREWS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN MARY HOPKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN ALFRED GOLDING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.53k | £3.62k | £6.02k | £4.39k | £5.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.39k | £3.82k | £5.30k | £5.25k | £5.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION DATED 25 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN NORTH SOMERSET SO THAT THEY MAY LEAD ACTIVE AND FULFILLING LIVES INTEGRATED INTO SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NORTH SOMERSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROOM 5 ROSELAWN
28 WALLISCOTE GROVE ROAD
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
AVON
BS23 1UJ
- Phone:
- 01934419426
- Email:
- mail@westondial.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window