Accounts and annual returns HINCKLEY CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1118751
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 20 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 20 October 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 17 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 17 December 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 10 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 10 December 2008 On Time